Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 811 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70811 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90317 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25319
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
RED   Redhill 9w/e 01/08/1948
6B   Mold Junction w/e 13/10/1951
8D   Widnes w/e 15/08/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/11/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 13/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN AFD Ashford m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 8D Widnes 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 13/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 811
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25319
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70811    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90317    
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90317    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev