Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 117 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3630 Week
» 23923 Month
» 201827 Year
» 1867203 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 813 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70813 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3047 on 26/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63047 w/e 24/07/1948
British Railways 90047 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24891
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Thu 08/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead on 29/08/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/11/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates m/e 30/11/1950
50A   York (North) 4w/e 20/06/1953
51A   Darlington 3w/e 16/06/1956
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/10/1958
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 29/12/1945
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 29/08/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   on 08/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/04/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 813
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24891
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70813    
26/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3047    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63047    
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90047    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
08/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90047    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev