|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 813 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24891 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70813 | ||
26/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3047 | ||
24/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63047 | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
08/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90047 | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
20/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
08/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90047 | ||
28/02/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |