Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 809 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2490 Week
» 22783 Month
» 200687 Year
» 1866063 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 814 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70814 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90318 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24892
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
25G   Farnley Junction (Reinstated) (from store on WR) w/e 31/12/1949
55E   Normanton w/e 07/11/1959
55D   Royston 4w/e 09/10/1965
55E   Normanton 4w/e 28/01/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 8w/e 25/02/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 W.D. \"Austerity\" 2-8-0\'s Position as at 31/12/47: By 31/12/47 the 700 W.D. 2-8-0's allocated to the Brtish Railways had all arrived in this country. The L.N.E.R. have their full 478 (i.e. original allocation of 410 plus 68 additional, vice 68 '0.6's' to the L.M.S.), and the Southern have their 50. The G.W.R. have 165 out of their total allocation of 172, the other 7 being at Harwich. The seven at Harwich are:-Nos. 70809, 70814, 70838, 70864, 77054, 78595, 79214. Of the 165 shown as 'on the G.W.R. system,' 89 are in traffic and the other 76 at Kingham and Marston. These 76 are officially classified as 'stabled awaiting heavy repair,' although it is believed that some of them have already been repaired in Belgium. The table below illustrates the final stages of the movement of W.D. 2-8-0's. TABLE REQUIRED HERE: Allocation On System 20/11/47 On System 18/12/47 On System 31/12/47 G.W.R. 172 157 161 165 L.N.E.R. 478 477 478 478 S.R. 50 50 50 50 Harwich 2 5 *7 Total in U.K. 700 686 694 700*For Western Region SLS/194804
11/09/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 814
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24892
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70814    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90318    
31/12/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90318    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev