Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 152 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3665 Week
» 23958 Month
» 201862 Year
» 1867238 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 815 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70815 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3048 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63048 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90048 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24893
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Mon 06/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
SKN   Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
51C   West Hartlepool 3w/e 12/11/1955
51L   Thornaby w/e 01/08/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 07/12/1945
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 08/08/1959
WDN   on 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 815
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24893
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70815    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3048    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63048    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90048    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
06/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90048    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev