Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 816 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70816 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3049 on 01/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63049 on Not applied
British Railways 90049 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24894
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal Mon 16/09/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 25/11/1950
64A   St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
68A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 27/11/1954
65D   Dawsholm 6w/e 30/12/1961
62C   Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 21/04/1962
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/04/1962
WDN   on 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 816
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24894
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70816    
01/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3049    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63049 but not taken up    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90049    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
27/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
16/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90049    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev