Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2443 Week
» 22736 Month
» 200640 Year
» 1866016 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 817 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70817 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90319 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24895
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal Sat 13/06/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
67C   Ayr 5w/e 24/03/1951
67C   Ayr m/e 31/03/1951
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 11/03/1961
67C   Ayr 4w/e 08/09/1962
62A   Thornton Junction 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK THJ Thornton Junction on 06/02/1947
ALLOC 67C Ayr m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 67C Ayr 6w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 13/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 817
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24895
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70817    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90319    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
13/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90319    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev