Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3625 Week
» 23918 Month
» 201822 Year
» 1867198 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 818 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70818 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3050 on 16/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63050 w/e 05/06/1948
British Railways 90050 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24896
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
31B   March 4w/e 18/10/1952
31B   March 4w/e 01/11/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 14/02/1953
34E   New England w/e 20/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 22/11/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 818
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24896
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70818    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3050    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63050    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90050    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90050    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev