Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 804 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2485 Week
» 22778 Month
» 200682 Year
» 1866058 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 821 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70821 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3051 on 16/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63051 w/e 03/04/1948
British Railways 90051 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25163
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
38E   Woodford Halse on 25/06/1950
38A   Colwick on 22/10/1950
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
41D   Canklow w/e 20/06/1959
40E   Colwick w/e 12/09/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse on 25/06/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 22/10/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Loco notes: LNER 6817 was the last loco of its class, and 3051, 9287 an 9361 were the first locos of their respective classes to be withdrawn. SLS/194604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 821
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25163
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70821    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3051    
03/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63051    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90051    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90051    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev