Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 809 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2490 Week
» 22783 Month
» 200687 Year
» 1866063 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 822 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70822 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3052 on 16/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63052 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90052 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25164
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal Thu 05/03/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead on 29/08/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
53C   Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 30/06/1950
38B   Annesley 4w/e 21/04/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
40B   Immingham 5w/e 22/09/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/01/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 26/01/1952
41G   Barnsley w/e 09/05/1959
41F   Mexborough w/e 20/06/1959
41D   Canklow w/e 26/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 05/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/01/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 29/08/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 3w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   on 05/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 822
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25164
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70822    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3052    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63052    
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90052    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
05/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90052    
04/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev