Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 840 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4353 Week
» 24646 Month
» 202550 Year
» 1867926 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 823 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70823 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3053 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63053 w/e 19/06/1948
British Railways 90053 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25165
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
40B   Immingham w/e 16/04/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 15/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 29/11/1945
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 04/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
04/10/1958 Colwich MPD - stored locomotives 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 823
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25165
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70823    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3053    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63053    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90053    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
04/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90053    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev