Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 824 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70824 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3054 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63054 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90054 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25166
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal Sat 21/01/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
54D   Consett 4w/e 18/04/1953
54B   Tyne Dock 4w/e 19/02/1955
50D   Starbeck 5w/e 20/07/1957
56A   Wakefield w/e 19/09/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 29/12/1962
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
55D   Royston 4w/e 16/07/1966
55E   Normanton 4w/e 08/10/1966
     Withdrawn on 21/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/11/1945
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 50D Starbeck 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 16/07/1966
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   on 21/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 824
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25166
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70824    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3054    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63054 but not taken up    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90054    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (54D)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (50D)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
21/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90054    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev