Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 101 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3614 Week
» 23907 Month
» 201811 Year
» 1867187 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 825 m/e 04/1944
War Dept. 70825 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90320 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25167
To Service During 04/1944
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1944
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 06/07/1957
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 10/05/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 825
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25167
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70825    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90320    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90320    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev