Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 796 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2477 Week
» 22770 Month
» 200674 Year
» 1866050 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 826 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70826 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3055 on 04/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63055 w/e 27/03/1948
British Railways 90055 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25168
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/03/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
IMM   Immingham on 30/05/1948
31B   March m/e 30/06/1950
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 20/08/1955
41H   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/07/1958
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 27/02/1960
34E   New England w/e 07/05/1960
40B   Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 24/12/1945
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 30/05/1948
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 14/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/11/1953 Darlington Works North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 826
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25168
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70826    
04/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3055    
27/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63055    
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90055    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
14/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90055    
06/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev