Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 406 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6333 Week
» 5071 Month
» 419392 Year
» 1640957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 827 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70827 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3056 on 16/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63056 on Not applied
British Railways 90056 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25169
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Wed 03/05/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 23 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1944
51A Darlington 3w/e 16/06/1956
56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/10/1958
56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
52G Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 03/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 29/08/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 10/11/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 03/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 827
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25169
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70827    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3056    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63056 but not taken up    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90056    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
03/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90056    

prev prev