Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 815 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2496 Week
» 22789 Month
» 200693 Year
» 1866069 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 828 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70828 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3057 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63057 w/e 27/03/1948
British Railways 90057 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25170
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
52H   Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 21/12/1963
50D   Goole 4w/e 31/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 25/11/1945
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 50D Goole 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 828
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25170
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70828    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3057    
27/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63057    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90057    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90057    
01/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev