Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 849 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4362 Week
» 24655 Month
» 202559 Year
» 1867935 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 829 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70829 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90321 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24899
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 24/06/1950
25D   Mirfield w/e 30/09/1950
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 07/10/1950
56A   Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 24/06/1950
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Stratton Park The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. SLS/194709
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 829
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24899
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70829    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90321    
24/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90321    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev