Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 809 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2490 Week
» 22783 Month
» 200687 Year
» 1866063 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 830 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70830 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3058 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63058 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90058 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24900
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
     Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003
18/01/1964 Bedford MPD (Scrapped) Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Inverurie Works (Scrapped) Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 830
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24900
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70830    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3058    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63058 but not taken up    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90058    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90058    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev