Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 840 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4353 Week
» 24646 Month
» 202550 Year
» 1867926 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 831 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70831 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3059 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63059 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90059 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24901
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/04/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 19/01/1952
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1952
36C   Frodingham 4w/e 22/03/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 29/11/1945
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/05/1965 Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. SLS/196506

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 831
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24901
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70831    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3059    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63059 but not taken up    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90059    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90059    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev