Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 832 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70832 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3060 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63060 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90060 w/e 11/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24902
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal w/e Mon 11/06/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
MAR   March on 12/09/1948
36A   Doncaster on 27/09/1953
31B   March on 16/09/1956
66A   Polmadie on 23/03/1957
65D   Dawsholm on 20/06/1957
66A   Polmadie on 08/01/1958
     Stored on 25/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 19/12/1945
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   w/e 11/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 18/10/1950 11/11/1950 25 days General    
Darlington Works 29/09/1952 31/10/1952 33 days General    
Darlington Works 04/11/1952 05/11/1952 2 days Adjustment Adjustments
 
Darlington Works 09/10/1954 05/11/1954 28 days General    
Darlington Works 17/11/1956 14/12/1956 28 days General    
Cowlairs Works 21/01/1959 07/02/1959 18 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 15/06/1959 15/06/1959 1 day Non Classified EO
 
Cowlairs Works 07/08/1959 11/08/1959 5 days Non Classified EO
 
Cowlairs Works 18/10/1960 19/10/1960 2 days Non Classified EO
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/04/1963 Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 832
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24902
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70832    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3060    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63060 but not taken up    
12/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.    
11/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90060    
29/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952.    
04/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Adjustments
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954.    
16/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956.    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
20/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
21/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959.    
15/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 15/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
EO
   
07/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
EO
   
18/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
EO
   
25/09/1961 To Store To Store    
11/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90060    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev