Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 774 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4287 Week
» 24580 Month
» 202484 Year
» 1867860 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 833 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70833 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90322 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24903
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Mon 17/08/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 26/01/1952
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
56D   Mirfield w/e 20/06/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 23/01/1960
56D   Mirfield w/e 16/09/1961
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 17/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 833
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24903
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70833    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90322    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
17/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90322    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev