Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 796 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2477 Week
» 22770 Month
» 200674 Year
» 1866050 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 834 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70834 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90323 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24904
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/12/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/12/1951
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 01/11/1952
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/03/1953
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/10/1955
84C   Banbury 4w/e 05/11/1960
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/12/1960
9G   Gorton on 20/05/1962
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 29/06/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 834
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24904
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70834    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90323    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
20/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90323    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev