Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 143 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3656 Week
» 23949 Month
» 201853 Year
» 1867229 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 836 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70836 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90324 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24906
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 02/12/1950
26C   Bolton 4w/e 31/12/1950
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 24/02/1951
26B   Agecroft m/e 28/02/1951
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 82C Swindon m/e 28/02/1950
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26B Agecroft m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 836
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24906
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70836    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90324    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90324    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev