Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 849 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4362 Week
» 24655 Month
» 202559 Year
» 1867935 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 837 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70837 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3061 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63061 on 06/07/1948 (at Scotswood)
British Railways 90061 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24907
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Tue 27/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR5 587 08/02/1955 WD 5,000g 9t 0cwt
BR5 62 31/03/1955 WD 5,000g 9t 0cwt
BR5 82 11/1957 WD 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
NPT   Newport (Teeside) (Ex War Department) on 03/12/1945
HTN   Heaton on 13/04/1947
YK   York (North) on 06/02/1949
DAR   Darlington on 13/02/1949
53A   Hull Dairycoates on 19/08/1951
53C   Hull Springhead on 21/03/1954
51A   Darlington on 08/06/1958
56A   Wakefield on 14/09/1958
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 03/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 27/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 03/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 27/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 18/09/1946 05/10/1946 18 days Light Repair Boiler wrecked - short of water
 
Gateshead Works 27/04/1947 16/05/1947 20 days Unclassified Select WI
 
Scotswood 04/06/1948 06/07/1948 33 days General Renumbered to BR (1st BR) number 63061
 
Gateshead Works 02/01/1950 20/01/1950 19 days Unclassified Left cylinder loose
 
Darlington Works 27/11/1950 30/12/1950 34 days General Axleboxes and motion badly worn
 
Darlington Works 22/06/1953 11/07/1953 20 days General    
Darlington Works 08/02/1955 25/03/1952 -1049 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 21/11/1955 10/12/1955 20 days General    
Darlington Works 22/10/1957 14/11/1957 24 days General    
Darlington Works 19/06/1961 27/07/1961 39 days General    
Darlington Works 03/06/1964 22/08/1964 81 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 837
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24907
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70837    
03/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) (Ex War Department)    
18/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler wrecked - short of water
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3061    
13/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
27/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1947. Dep: 16/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Select WI
   
04/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Scotswood (General) - Arr: 04/06/1948. Dep: 06/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (1st BR) number 63061
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90061    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 20/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Left cylinder loose
   
27/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Axleboxes and motion badly worn
   
19/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
22/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.    
21/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
08/02/1955 Tender Tender fitted: BR5 number 587    
08/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1952.    
31/03/1955 Tender Tender fitted: BR5 number 62    
21/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955.    
22/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 14/11/1957.    
11/1957 Tender Tender fitted: BR5 number 82    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
19/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 27/07/1961.    
03/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1964. Dep: 22/08/1964.    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
27/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90061    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev