Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 838 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70838 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90325 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24908
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Mon 13/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
25G   Farnley Junction (Reinstated) (from store on WR) 2w/e 14/01/1950
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn on 13/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   w/e 13/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 W.D. \"Austerity\" 2-8-0\'s Position as at 31/12/47: By 31/12/47 the 700 W.D. 2-8-0's allocated to the Brtish Railways had all arrived in this country. The L.N.E.R. have their full 478 (i.e. original allocation of 410 plus 68 additional, vice 68 '0.6's' to the L.M.S.), and the Southern have their 50. The G.W.R. have 165 out of their total allocation of 172, the other 7 being at Harwich. The seven at Harwich are:-Nos. 70809, 70814, 70838, 70864, 77054, 78595, 79214. Of the 165 shown as 'on the G.W.R. system,' 89 are in traffic and the other 76 at Kingham and Marston. These 76 are officially classified as 'stabled awaiting heavy repair,' although it is believed that some of them have already been repaired in Belgium. The table below illustrates the final stages of the movement of W.D. 2-8-0's. TABLE REQUIRED HERE: Allocation On System 20/11/47 On System 18/12/47 On System 31/12/47 G.W.R. 172 157 161 165 L.N.E.R. 478 477 478 478 S.R. 50 50 50 50 Harwich 2 5 *7 Total in U.K. 700 686 694 700*For Western Region SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 838
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24908
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70838    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90325    
14/01/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
13/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90325    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev