Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 785 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4298 Week
» 24591 Month
» 202495 Year
» 1867871 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 839 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70839 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90326 m/e 04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24909
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal w/e Mon 11/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
YK   York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
25G   Farnley Junction w/e 29/04/1950
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 24/02/1951
25D   Mirfield m/e 28/02/1951
56A   Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 27/08/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   w/e 11/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 839
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24909
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70839    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
04/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90326    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
11/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90326    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    

prev prev