Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 848 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2529 Week
» 22822 Month
» 200726 Year
» 1866102 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 840 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70840 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3062 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63062 w/e 05/06/1948
British Railways 90062 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24910
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Thu 07/01/1960
Service Life 15 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
30A   Stratford on 06/02/1955
     Withdrawn on 07/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England on 18/02/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/02/1955
WDN   on 07/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 840
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24910
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70840    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3062    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63062    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90062    
06/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 90062    
28/02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev