Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2442 Week
» 22735 Month
» 200639 Year
» 1866015 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 841 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70841 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3063 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63063 w/e 02/10/1948
British Railways 90063 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24911
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
CAR   Carlisle Canal w/e 27/03/1948
35C   Spital Bridge on 13/08/1950
31B   March on 31/01/1960
36A   Doncaster on 18/09/1960
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAR Carlisle Canal w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge on 13/08/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 01/10/1960
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 26/04/1957 18/05/1957 23 days General    
Darlington Works 17/11/1959 10/12/1959 24 days General    
Gorton Works 22/11/1961 02/12/1961 11 days Non Classified    
Crewe Works 27/11/1962 22/12/1962 26 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
01/02/1960 Peterborough Midland Closure Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 841
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24911
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70841    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3063    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63063    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90063    
13/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
26/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957.    
17/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 10/12/1959.    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/11/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961.    
27/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1962. Dep: 22/12/1962.    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90063    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev