Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 796 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2477 Week
» 22770 Month
» 200674 Year
» 1866050 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 842 m/e 05/1944
War Dept. 70842 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3064 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63064 w/e 01/05/1948
British Railways 90064 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24914
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal Wed 15/01/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
IMM   Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
31B   March m/e 30/06/1950
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
38A   Colwick on 29/01/1956
41G   Barnsley w/e 09/05/1959
41F   Mexborough w/e 20/06/1959
41D   Canklow w/e 08/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 15/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 24/12/1945
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   on 15/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 03/08/1957 07/09/1957 36 days General    
Gorton Works 13/02/1958 08/03/1958 24 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 18/06/1959 02/07/1959 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 25/07/1960 27/08/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 22/02/1962 02/03/1962 9 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 842
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24914
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70842    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3064    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63064    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90064    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
03/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957.    
13/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958.    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
18/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/06/1959. Dep: 02/07/1959.    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
25/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960.    
22/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 02/03/1962.    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
15/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90064    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev