Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 843 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70843 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90327 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24916
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/01/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/09/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
27B   Aintree w/e 10/01/1959
24B   Rose Grove w/e 15/09/1962
9K   Bolton w/e 25/01/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 22/08/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 16/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DID Didcot m/e 31/03/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 9K Bolton 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 16/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 843
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24916
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70843    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
03/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90327    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
16/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90327    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev