Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 835 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4348 Week
» 24641 Month
» 202545 Year
» 1867921 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 844 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70844 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3065 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63065 w/e 21/08/1948
British Railways 90065 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24917
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/03/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
CLK   Colwick (on loan) (On loan from WD) on 04/01/1946
WFD   Woodford Halse on 26/10/1946
2G   Woodford Halse (on loan) (Boundary change - loco remained at Woodford, by now LMR, on loan from ER) on 01/02/1958
2G   Woodford Halse (loan made permanent) on 23/02/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 28/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/01/1946
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 26/10/1946
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963
WDN   w/e 28/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 844
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24917
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70844    
04/01/1946 Allocation Loaned to Colwick (CLK) (On loan from WD)    
26/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3065    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63065    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90065    
01/02/1958 Allocation Loaned to Woodford Halse (2G) (Boundary change - loco remained at Woodford, by now LMR, on loan from ER)    
28/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90065    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev