Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 849 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4362 Week
» 24655 Month
» 202559 Year
» 1867935 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 845 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70845 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90328 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24918
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/05/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
26A   Newton Heath w/e 31/01/1959
26F   Patricroft w/e 15/09/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 09/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
WDN   w/e 09/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 845
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24918
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70845    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90328    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
09/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90328    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev