Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 863 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4376 Week
» 24669 Month
» 202573 Year
» 1867949 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 846 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70846 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3066 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63066 w/e 13/11/1948
British Railways 90066 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24919
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Fri 24/05/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
IMM   Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
31B   March on 18/06/1950
36A   Doncaster on 27/09/1953
36B   Mexborough on 13/06/1954
38A   Colwick on 29/01/1956
38E   Woodford Halse on 10/02/1957
     Withdrawn on 24/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK NWE New England on 18/01/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 23/02/1957
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 25/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 29/05/1951 07/07/1951 40 days General    
Darlington Works 20/10/1952 08/11/1952 20 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 13/07/1953 15/08/1953 34 days General    
Darlington Works 09/12/1955 06/01/1956 29 days General    
Gorton Works 17/03/1956 21/04/1956 36 days Heavy Casual    
Crewe Works 30/10/1958 26/11/1958 28 days Light Intermediate    
Crewe Works 18/07/1960 13/08/1960 27 days General    
Crewe Works 08/02/1961 13/03/1961 34 days Heavy Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 846
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24919
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70846    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3066    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63066    
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
29/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951.    
07/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90066    
20/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.    
13/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953.    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
09/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.    
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
30/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958.    
18/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960.    
08/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1961. Dep: 13/03/1961.    
24/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90066    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev