Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 783 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4296 Week
» 24589 Month
» 202493 Year
» 1867869 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 847 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70847 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3067 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63067 on 21/05/1948 (On release from Scotswood)
British Railways 90067 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24920
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Mon 05/10/1964 (Card says 15/10/64, on shed)
Withdrawal Notes Card says 15/10/64, on shed
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
NPT   Newport (Teeside) (on loan) (Ex War Department) on 12/12/1945
HTN   Heaton on 13/04/1947
SKN   Stockton on 06/02/1949
51C   West Hartlepool on 14/08/1955
     Withdrawn on 05/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 12/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 10/09/1955
WDN   on 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Scotswood 16/04/1948 21/05/1948 36 days General    
Doncaster Works 13/07/1949 29/07/1949 17 days Non Classified Gas lighting fitted
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1950 04/02/1950 19 days Accident repairs Accident damage
 
Darlington Works 26/02/1951 21/03/1951 24 days General General withdrawn
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1952 27/06/1953 389 days General    
Darlington Works 02/01/1956 01/02/1956 31 days General    
Gateshead Works 18/09/1956 16/11/1956 60 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 29/07/1958 28/08/1958 31 days Light Intermediate    
Darlington Works 05/10/1961 17/11/1961 44 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 847
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24920
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70847    
12/12/1945 Allocation Loaned to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) (Ex War Department)    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3067    
13/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
16/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Scotswood (General) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948.    
21/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63067    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90067    
13/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 29/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Gas lighting fitted
   
17/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Accident repairs) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Accident damage
   
26/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
General withdrawn
   
04/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1952. Dep: 27/06/1953.    
14/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
02/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1956. Dep: 01/02/1956.    
18/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956.    
29/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1958. Dep: 28/08/1958.    
05/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961.    
05/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90067    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev