Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 803 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2484 Week
» 22777 Month
» 200681 Year
» 1866057 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 848 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70848 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3068 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63068 w/e 17/07/1948
British Railways 90068 on 11/11/1950 (at Darlington Works)

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24921
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sun 10/07/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at R A Kings (Norwich)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
CLK   Colwick (on loan) (ex War Department) on 22/11/1945
GOR   Gorton on 18/08/1946
CLK   Colwick on 20/10/1946
ANN   Annesley on 01/02/1948
CLK   Colwick on 23/05/1948
NEV   Neville Hill on 29/08/1948
NPT   Newport (Teeside) on 07/08/1949
50A   York (North) on 16/06/1957
56A   Wakefield on 01/11/1959
56F   Low Moor on 08/11/1959
56D   Mirfield on 10/09/1961
56A   Wakefield on 05/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 10/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 22/11/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 10/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Scotswood 15/08/1947 03/12/1947 111 days General    
Scotswood 13/05/1948 09/07/1948 58 days Heavy Casual    
Darlington Works 09/10/1950 11/11/1950 34 days General    
Darlington Works 25/08/1952 20/09/1952 27 days General    
Darlington Works 27/08/1953 03/09/1953 8 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 29/07/1954 10/09/1954 44 days General    
Darlington Works 05/07/1955 28/07/1955 24 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 08/05/1956 07/06/1956 31 days General    
Darlington Works 22/09/1958 21/10/1958 30 days General    
Darlington Works 15/12/1958 31/12/1958 17 days Non Classified    
Darlington Works 22/08/1960 29/08/1960 8 days Non Classified    
Darlington Works 15/03/1962 19/04/1962 36 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 848
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24921
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70848    
22/11/1945 Allocation Loaned to Colwick (CLK) (ex War Department)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3068    
15/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Scotswood (General) - Arr: 15/08/1947. Dep: 03/12/1947.    
01/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
13/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Scotswood (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1948. Dep: 09/07/1948.    
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63068    
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
09/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.    
11/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90068    
25/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.    
27/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 03/09/1953.    
29/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954.    
05/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 28/07/1955.    
08/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956.    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
22/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958.    
15/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 15/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958.    
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
08/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
22/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 29/08/1960.    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
15/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962.    
05/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
10/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90068    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich    

prev prev