Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 121 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3634 Week
» 23927 Month
» 201831 Year
» 1867207 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 851 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70851 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90331 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24912
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
26E   Lees (Oldham) w/e 23/09/1961
26F   Patricroft w/e 15/09/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 09/02/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 30/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 851
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24912
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70851    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90331    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
30/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90331    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev