Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 815 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2496 Week
» 22789 Month
» 200693 Year
» 1866069 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 852 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70852 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3071 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63071 w/e 08/05/1948
British Railways 90071 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24924
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sat 22/04/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 25/11/1950
64A   St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
66B   Motherwell 5w/e 24/03/1951
66B   Motherwell m/e 31/03/1951
66C   Hamilton (West) 4w/e 04/08/1956
66B   Motherwell 4w/e 27/09/1958
62C   Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 03/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 66B Motherwell m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   on 22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
31/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. SLS/194912
30/04/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 852
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24924
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70852    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3071    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63071    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90071    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
04/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
27/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90071    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev