Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 849 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4362 Week
» 24655 Month
» 202559 Year
» 1867935 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 853 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70853 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90332 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24913
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sat 21/01/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
91M   To London Midland Region 3w/e 10/06/1950
91M   To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/06/1950
     Withdrawn on 21/01/1967
55E   Normanton 4w/e 28/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HIT Hither Green m/e 30/06/1947
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   on 21/01/1967
ALLOC 55E Normanton 8w/e 25/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
05/01/1949 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. SLS/194902
30/06/1950 W.D. \"8F\" Some of the W.D. '8F' class previously on loan to the Southern Region have gone to the L.M.R., including 90332, 90347, 90527, 90619, an 90655 to Huddersfield (25B). SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 853
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24913
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70853    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90332    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
21/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90332    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev