Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 854 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 70854 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3069 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63069 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90069 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24915
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sun 30/01/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
ANN   Annesley on 29/06/1947
CLK   Colwick on 15/11/1947
ANN   Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
YK   York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
91W   To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 06/11/1954
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
81C   Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
36A   Doncaster on 02/12/1962
41D   Canklow w/e 26/01/1963
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 03/04/1965
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 30/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
LOAN 40B Immingham on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 03/04/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   on 30/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 854
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24915
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70854    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3069    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63069 but not taken up    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90069    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
30/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90069    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev