Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 127 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3640 Week
» 23933 Month
» 201837 Year
» 1867213 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 857 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 70857 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90333 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24927
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Mon 25/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
24A   Accrington w/e 21/05/1949
25A   Wakefield w/e 20/08/1949
56F   Low Moor 5w/e 15/11/1958
56D   Mirfield w/e 16/09/1961
56A   Wakefield w/e 07/03/1964
     Withdrawn on 25/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 20/08/1949
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   on 25/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 857
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24927
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70857    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90333    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
20/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
25/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90333    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev