Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 148 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3661 Week
» 23954 Month
» 201858 Year
» 1867234 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 858 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 70858 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3072 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63072 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90072 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24928
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Mon 27/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/01/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
51L   Thornaby w/e 06/02/1960
50D   Goole w/e 31/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 27/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW HTN Heaton on 15/07/1947
ALLOC MAR March on 15/07/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   on 27/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1962 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. SLS/196205
09/09/1963 Thornaby MPD (in store) The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 858
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24928
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70858    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3072    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63072    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90072    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
27/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90072    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev