Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 859 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 70859 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90334 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24929
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal w/e Mon 18/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
55E   Normanton 5w/e 20/07/1957
55C   Farnley Junction w/e 24/01/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 4w/e 24/01/1959
WDN   w/e 18/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 859
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24929
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70859    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90334    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
18/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90334    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev