Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 814 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2495 Week
» 22788 Month
» 200692 Year
» 1866068 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 860 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 70860 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90335 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24930
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
24A   Accrington w/e 21/05/1949
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 29/10/1949
24F   Fleetwood w/e 10/02/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 09/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 5w/e 03/03/1962
WDN   w/e 09/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 860
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24930
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70860    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90335    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
09/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90335    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    

prev prev