Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 11 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1921 Week
» 2860 Month
» 206350 Year
» 1871726 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 864 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 70864 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90336 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24934
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Sun 09/01/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
25G   Farnley Junction (Reinstated) (from store on WR) 2w/e 14/01/1950
55D   Royston w/e 20/06/1959
56A   Wakefield w/e 26/10/1963
     Withdrawn on 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   on 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
31/12/1947 W.D. \"Austerity\" 2-8-0\'s Position as at 31/12/47: By 31/12/47 the 700 W.D. 2-8-0's allocated to the Brtish Railways had all arrived in this country. The L.N.E.R. have their full 478 (i.e. original allocation of 410 plus 68 additional, vice 68 '0.6's' to the L.M.S.), and the Southern have their 50. The G.W.R. have 165 out of their total allocation of 172, the other 7 being at Harwich. The seven at Harwich are:-Nos. 70809, 70814, 70838, 70864, 77054, 78595, 79214. Of the 165 shown as 'on the G.W.R. system,' 89 are in traffic and the other 76 at Kingham and Marston. These 76 are officially classified as 'stabled awaiting heavy repair,' although it is believed that some of them have already been repaired in Belgium. The table below illustrates the final stages of the movement of W.D. 2-8-0's. TABLE REQUIRED HERE: Allocation On System 20/11/47 On System 18/12/47 On System 31/12/47 G.W.R. 172 157 161 165 L.N.E.R. 478 477 478 478 S.R. 50 50 50 50 Harwich 2 5 *7 Total in U.K. 700 686 694 700*For Western Region SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 864
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24934
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70864    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90336    
14/01/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
09/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90336    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev