Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1930 Week
» 2869 Month
» 206359 Year
» 1871735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 866 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 70866 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90338 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24936
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
     Withdrawn w/e 16/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/11/1949
WDN   w/e 16/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Cut-up Shop) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 866
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24936
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70866    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90338    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    
16/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90338    

prev prev