Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 862 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4375 Week
» 24668 Month
» 202572 Year
» 1867948 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 870 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 70870 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3073 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63073 w/e 19/06/1948
British Railways 90073 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25412
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
ANN   Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 26/06/1948
34E   New England w/e 12/12/1959
36A   Doncaster w/e 13/04/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England on 17/02/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/06/1948
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 27/04/1963
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 870
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25412
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70870    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3073    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63073    
26/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90073    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
13/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90073    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev