Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 892 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1910 Week
» 2849 Month
» 206339 Year
» 1871715 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 871 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 70871 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90340 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24939
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/07/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
36B   Mexborough w/e 25/02/1950
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
36A   Doncaster w/e 21/10/1961
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 04/03/1947
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 871
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24939
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70871    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90340    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90340    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev