Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 116 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3629 Week
» 23922 Month
» 201826 Year
» 1867202 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 872 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 70872 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3074 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63074 w/e 24/04/1948
British Railways 90074 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24940
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
52H   Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
56A   Wakefield w/e 21/12/1963
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 25/03/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 11/12/1945
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 25/03/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Stooperdale) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 872
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24940
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70872    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3074    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63074    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90074    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90074    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev