Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 886 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1904 Week
» 2843 Month
» 206333 Year
» 1871709 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 876 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 70876 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90343 m/e 11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24944
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/12/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 02/12/1950
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 31/12/1950
26C   Bolton 4w/e 27/01/1951
26C   Bolton m/e 31/01/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 21/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 31/12/1946
LOAN 82D Westbury m/e 28/02/1950
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 26B Agecroft m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   w/e 21/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 SLS/194701
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 876
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24944
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70876    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
11/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90343    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90343    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev