Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 3 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2078 Week
» 27439 Month
» 260359 Year
» 1925735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9733 on 04/01/1935

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 285
To Service Sat 04/01/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/09/1965
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/01/1935
84D   Leamington 4w/e 26/12/1959
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 30/01/1960
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/07/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 25/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/07/1961
WDN   w/e 25/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/01/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9733
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
25/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9733    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev